Carr, Michele Marie (CPSO#: 65456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Virginia Medicine
PO Box 9200
1 Medical Center Dr
Morgantown WV  26501
United States
Phone: 304 293 3213
Fax: 304 293 2902

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania
USA - West Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELE MARIE CARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Comprehensive - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2010