Carr, Simon David (CPSO#: 111351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2017

Expiry Date:  03 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 23 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Otolaryngology Head
and Neck Surgery, Room 8N 873
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4630
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON DAVID CARR may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CARR is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. CARR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CARR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CARR shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. CARR ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. CARR ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 03 Jan 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 22 Feb 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 31 Mar 2018
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jan 2018