Carr-Locke, David Leslie (CPSO#: 67391)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cambridge, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Oct 2007