Carraway, James Howard (CPSO#: 61701)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Oct 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Virginia, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2002