Carrie, Douglas William (CPSO#: 57133)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003