Carriere, Philippe Richard (CPSO#: 66074)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 07 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Sep 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Mar 2001
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 07 Sep 2001

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Sep 2001
Summary:

 On September 7, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Carriere guilty of professional misconduct 
 with respect to failing to meet the standard of practice of the profession and sexually abusing 
 patients and ordered the following penalty:


1)	Dr. Carriere be reprimanded and the fact of the 
 reprimand be recorded on the Register.

2)	That the Registrar revoke Dr. Carriere(s c ertificate 
 of registration, such revocation to 	take effect immediately (September 7, 2001).

3)	Dr. Carriere 
 pay to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario ((the College() the 	costs of this 
 hearing fixed in the sum of $2,500.00, and that the costs are payable 		forthwith; and ,

4)	Dr. 
 Carriere reimburse the College for funding paid by the College to the patients named 	in 
 Appendicies in the Amended Notice of Hearing, for therapy and counseling pursuant to 	the 
 provision of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the 	Regulated Health 
 Profession Act, 1991.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 14, 2001