Carriere, Rebecca (CPSO#: 86860)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: McEvilly, Rebecca (used until: 24 Feb 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
300-2085 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON  L5A 4G1
Phone: 9058487586
Fax: 9058487602
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Carriere Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Carriere ( CPSO# 86860 )

Business Address:
2085 Hurontario Street
Suite 300
Mississauga ON  L5S 4G1
Phone Number: (905) 848-7586

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA CARRIERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARRIERE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012