Carrizo, Aldo Gabriel (CPSO#: 104144)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Cordoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Aug 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 23 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 19 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017