Carroll, Bryan William (CPSO#: 26397)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 10 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 May 1990
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 12 Dec 2008
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Mar 2009
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Oct 2012
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 15 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 22 Jan 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2014

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Oct 2012
Summary:

On October 15, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Bryan William Carroll committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he contravened a term, condition or limitation on his 
certificate of registration, and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to 
the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Carroll admitted the 
allegations. 
 
In 2008, Dr. Carroll was the subject of a discipline proceeding, in which the Discipline 
Committee ordered, among other things, that he undergo a Comprehensive Practice Assessment 
(CPA) and that he abide by any and all recommendations made. The CPA assessor recommended 
that Dr. Carroll comply with the currently accepted guidelines with respect to ordering 
colposcopy and uroflow studies. On January 8, 2010, Dr. Carroll entered into an undertaking to 
abide by the currently accepted consensus threshold for ordering colposcopy and uroflow studies.  
 
In 2010, Dr. Carroll's supervisor reported that Dr. Carroll continued to perform colposcopy 
without indication. An investigation, including a review by an independent assessor, found that 
Dr. Carroll had performed repeated colposcopy and/or uroflow studies where they were not 
indicated or were unnecessary in relation to 7 of 15 patient charts reviewed.   
 
In three occasions in 2011, Dr. Carroll's supervisor provided positive reports indicating that in 
the charts he reviewed, Dr. Carroll performed few colposcopies, all of which were indicated, and 
that he saw no evidence of patient care or prescribing that did not meet the appropriate standard 
of care for an obstetrician/gynaecologist practising in Ontario. Prior to the referral of this matter 
to the Discipline Committee, on April 12, 2012, Dr. Carroll entered into an undertaking agreeing 
that, effective immediately, he will cease to engage in colposcopy and uroflow studies altogether. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:  
      the Registrar suspend Dr. Carroll's certificate of registration for a period of two (2) 
      months, to commence October 15th, 2012.     
      Dr. Carroll appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
      Dr. Carroll pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within thirty (30) days 
      from the date of this Order. 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 15, 2012


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Dec 2008
Summary:

On December 12, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bryan William Carroll to have 
committed an act of professional misconduct that Dr. Carroll has committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession 
and has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having 
regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional.    The Committee ordered and directed the following:  
 
      1.    the Registrar to suspend Dr. Carroll s certificate of registration for a period of two 
            months, to commence on January 1, 2009. 
 
      2.          the Registrar to impose immediately the following terms, conditions and 
            limitations on Dr. Carroll s Certificate of Registration: 
 
            (a)   Dr. Carroll shall not prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs and substances 
                  as defined in Schedules I to IV of the Controlled Drugs and Substances 
                  Act, including but not limited to all narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, 
                  controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances; 
  
            (b)   At his own expense, Dr. Carroll shall undergo a comprehensive practice 
                  assessment, to be completed no later than within four months of his return 
                  to practice on March 1, 2009, by an assessor approved by the College (the 
                  CPA  ) and shall abide by any and all recommendations made as result of  
                  the CPA;  
 
            (c)   Dr. Carroll shall practice only under the supervision of a practice monitor 
                  approved by the College who has signed an undertaking and who has 
                  reviewed the College s expert report dated September 18, 2007 and who 
                  will be provided with a copy of the CPA report.  This practice monitor 
                  will be at Dr. Carroll s expense and will report regularly to the College or 
                  immediately if the practice monitor has concerns regarding patient safety 
                  or regarding Dr. Carroll s compliance with the terms of this order;  
 
            (d)   If there are no recommendations for remediation arising from the CPA, Dr. 
                  Carroll s supervision as referred to in subparagraph 3(c) above will 
                  terminate following his completion of the CPA. If there are any 
                  recommendations for remediation arising from the CPA, Dr. Carroll s 
                  supervision shall remain in place until the assessor confirms to the College 
                  that the remediation has been successfully completed;  
 
            (e)   At his own expense, Dr. Carroll shall undergo a re-assessment of his 
                  practice, the results of which are to be provided to the College, to be 
                  conducted approximately nine months after his completion of the CPA, if 
                  no remediation is required as a result of the CPA, or nine months after the 
                  assessor confirms to the College that the remediation has been successfully 
                  completed, if there is a recommendation for remediation following the 
                  CPA; and 
      (f)   Dr. Carroll shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced 
            inspections of his practice(s) and patient charts by College representatives 
            for the purposes of assessing his compliance with these terms, conditions 
            and limitations on his certificate of registration.  
              
3.     that Dr. Carroll to pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650.00, within 30 
      days of the date of this Order.   
              
4.          that the results of this proceeding to be included in the register. 
              
               
              
               
              
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 12, 2008

Concerns

Source: Fitness to Practice Committee
Active Date: December 31, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Carroll has resigned from the College and has agreed not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.