Carroll, Derek William (CPSO#: 25063)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jan 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 1990