Carruthers, Christopher Calvert (CPSO#: 22028)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.C. Carruthers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014