Carsley, Holly Holmes (CPSO#: 69696)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: Carsley, Holly (used until: 05 Dec 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2010