Carson, Brian Glen Craig (CPSO#: 68957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
99 Sinclair Avenue
Georgetown ON  L7G 5G1
Phone: (905) 873-3344
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.G. Craig Carson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Carson ( CPSO# 68957 )

Business Address:
204 - 99 Sinclair Avenue
Georgetown ON  L7G 5G1
Phone Number: (905) 873-3344

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN GLEN CRAIG CARSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1997