Carson, George Douglas (CPSO#: 23075)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Oct 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Sep 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011