Carson, Sharon Kathleen (CPSO#: 70316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: Bates, Sharon Kathleen (used until: 22 Oct 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Guelph line unit 4
Burlington ON  L7M 3M8
Phone: (289) 288-0061
Fax: (289) 288-0473
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Carson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Carson ( CPSO# 70316 )

Business Address:
4 - 700 Guelph Line
Burlington ON  L7R 3M8

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON KATHLEEN CARSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000