Carswell, David James (CPSO#: 24958)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Feb 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Nov 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Feb 2016