Cartan, Stephen Jerome (CPSO#: 22929)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 2015

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 May 1988
Summary:

 In May 1988, Dr. Cartan pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant 
 to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
 regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Discipline Committee 
 accepted this plea, and found Dr. Cartan guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the 
 Committee ordered that Dr. Cartan be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on 
 the Register.  The Committee further ordered that the Doctor's licence to practice be suspended 
 for a period of ninety days, but that the final sixty days of the suspension would themselves be 
 suspended if a sworn affidavit were provided to the Registrar prior to the commencement of the 
 final sixty days of the suspension period to the effect that all outstanding medical-legal reports 
 and other reports of like nature had been completed satisfactorily and delivered, or that 
 satisfactory arrangements had been made for their completion, and setting forth particulars of 
 such reports that had been delivered and the arrangements made for the completion of those not 
 then delivered.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 20 May 1988