Carten, Kathleen Anne (CPSO#: 104774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Queen's University
70 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2543
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN ANNE CARTEN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CARTEN is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. CARTEN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CARTEN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CARTEN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CARTEN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CARTEN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Sep 2016 to 23 Oct 2016
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017