Carter, Beverley Anne (CPSO#: 68597)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 May 2005