Carter, David Alexander (CPSO#: 50349)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 25 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ALEXANDER CARTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Oct 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1988