Carter, Erin Melissa (CPSO#: 82682)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6175
Fax: (416) 530-6105
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN MELISSA CARTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 03 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 04 Nov 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2011