Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Carter, Gordon Wilfred (CPSO#: 14371)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jan 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1965
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 May 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2000