Carter, Melissa Terry (CPSO#: 80678)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Genetics
Max Keeping Wing, CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 2L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2611
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA TERRY CARTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009