Carter, William Joel (CPSO#: 69492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Near North Medical Clinic
North Bay ON  P1B 0A7
Phone: (705) 495-2685
Fax: (705) 495-4128
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.J. Carter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2006

Dr. W. Carter ( CPSO# 69492 )

Business Address:
Near North Medical Clinic
201 - 66 Josephine Street
North Bay ON  P1B 0A7
Phone Number: (705) 495-2685

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. WILLIAM JOEL CARTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997