Cartotto, Robert Charles (CPSO#: 57214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 May 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Burn Unit
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room D-712
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6706
Fax: (416) 480-6708
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT CHARLES CARTOTTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARTOTTO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1989