Carvalho, Elda Eveline (CPSO#: 85463)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: De Carvalho, Elda Eveline Baptistelli Pereira (used until: 13 Sep 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:U ESTADUAL PAULISTA-BOTUCATU SAO PAOLO, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ellesmere Xray Associate
1815 Ironstone Major, Suite 15B
Toronto ON  L1W 3W9
Phone: 905-831-1800
Fax: 905-831-1806
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E E Carvalho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Carvalho ( CPSO# 85463 )

Business Address:
Suite 15B
1815 Ironstone Major
Pickering ON  L1W 3W9
Phone Number: (905) 831-1800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELDA EVELINE CARVALHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARVALHO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2012