Carvalho, Michael (CPSO#: 101208)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pathology Residency Program
McMaster University
HSC-2N22C
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905 807 7358
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Pathology
St Joseph's Hospital - Charlton
50 Charlton Av East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A3
Canada
Phone: 905 807 7358
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Department of Pathology
Juravinski Hospital
699 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Canada
Phone: 905 807 7358
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Department of Pathology
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: 905 807 7358
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Carvalho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Carvalho ( CPSO# 66298 )
Dr. M. Carvalho ( CPSO# 101208)

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CARVALHO shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CARVALHO is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. CARVALHO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CARVALHO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CARVALHO shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CARVALHO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CARVALHO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018