Casale, Maria (CPSO#: 72738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Immigration Medical Examiners (IME)
751 Victoria St. South, Suite B106
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone: 519-748-8510
Fax: 888-706-0513
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Guelph Public Health
160 Chancellors Way
Guelph ON  N1G 0E1
Canada
Phone: 1-800-265-7239 Ext. 0
Fax: 855-934-5463
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria Casale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Casale ( CPSO# 72738 )

Business Address:
160 Chancellors Way
Guelph ON  N1G 0E1
Phone Number: (800) 265-7293

Business Address:
Immigration Medical Examiners
Suite B106
751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone Number: (519) 748-8510

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA CASALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASALE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2000