Case, Allison Mary (CPSO#: 66479)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2001