Casey, Deborah Ksan (CPSO#: 94274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
General Respirology Clinic
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
A-Wing, 4th Floor, Room 459
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-4758
Fax: 416-480-5153
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
Suite 1011, 123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: 416-813-2277
Fax: 416-260-3203
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 03 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH KSAN CASEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012