Casey, Richard William (CPSO#: 30392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Apr 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 407
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone: (905) 338-3130
Fax: (905) 338-3150
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD WILLIAM CASEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1984