Cash, Rebecca Lee (CPSO#: 80666)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone: (905) 850-0004
Fax: (905) 850-0006
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca L. Cash Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cash ( CPSO# 80666 )

Business Address:
Suite 207
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone Number: (905) 850-0004

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 26 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA LEE CASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 18 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 04 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 05 May 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2010