Cashin, Carolyn Ann (CPSO#: 86311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: Connors, Carolyn Ann (used until: 29 Jun 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Emergency Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7424
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN ANN CASHIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CASHIN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. CASHIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CASHIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CASHIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CASHIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CASHIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 18 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 19 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017