Caskey, Elizabeth Rosemary Bernice (CPSO#: 73166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kanata North Medical Centre
832 March Road
Kanata ON  K2W 0C9
Phone: (613) 599-5599
Fax: (613) 599-1005
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Caskey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Caskey ( CPSO# 73166 )

Business Address:
Kanata North Medical Centre
832 March Road
Suite 2
Kanata ON  K2W 0C9
Phone Number: (613) 599-5599

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ROSEMARY BERNICE CASKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASKEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 14 Dec 1998 to 08 Jan 1999
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jan 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2000