Casola, Paul Gerard (CPSO#: 54052)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 510
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone: (416) 277-8361
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Casola Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Casola ( CPSO# 54052 )

Business Address:
Suite 510
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone Number: (416) 277-8361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL GERARD CASOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASOLA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985