Casper, Robert Fredric Joseph (CPSO#: 26688)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jan 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1101
655 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2K4
Phone: (416) 972-0110
Fax: (416) 972-0036
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Casper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Casper ( CPSO# 26688 )

Business Address:
1101 - 655 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2K4
Phone Number: (416) 972-0110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT FREDRIC JOSEPH CASPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASPER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Aug 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1984