Cass, Daniel Edward (CPSO#: 59731)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Room 1M-134
Toronto ON  M6R 1B8
Phone: (416) 530-6033
Fax: (416) 530-6835
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Inner City Family Health Team
69 Queen Street East
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 368-5666
Fax: (416) 368-2679
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL EDWARD CASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1989