Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Cassam, Humaira (CPSO#: 60926)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leslieville Medical Centre
17 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M4M 3H9
Phone: (416) 465-6606
Fax: (416) 465-6609
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

College Square Medical Centre
1980 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C6
Canada
Phone: (613) 224-6606
Fax: (613) 224-6162
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Humaira Cassam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Cassam ( CPSO# 60926 )

Business Address:
Leslieville Medical Centre
17 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M4M 3H9
Phone Number: (416) 465-6606

Business Address:
College Square Medical Centre
1980 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C6
Phone Number: (613) 224-6606

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUMAIRA CASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASSAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1990