Cassar, Stephen Louis (CPSO#: 67353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 220 Gaslight Plaza
579 3rd Street Southeast
Medicine Hat AB  T1A 0H2
Phone: (403) 529-1770
Fax: (403) 529-1178
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medicine Hat Regional Hospital
666 5th Street Southwest
Medicine Hat AB  T1A 4G6
Canada
Phone: (403) 529-8000
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN LOUIS CASSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASSAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1993