Cassells, Michael John (CPSO#: 17367)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998