Casserly, Courtney Sarah (CPSO#: 89078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario
N6A 5A5
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 663-3133
Fax: (519) 663-3107
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COURTNEY SARAH CASSERLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASSERLY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2016