Casserly, James Gordon (CPSO#: 20461)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Email: pcass13@hotmail.com
Date Received: 30 Aug 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2010

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: January 31, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 31, 2010, Dr. Casserly has resigned from the College and has agreed never to practise again in Ontario or any other jurisdiction and has done so during investigations and a disciplinary proceeding.