Casses, Alberto (CPSO#: 59271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Professional Centre
Suite 303
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone: (705) 735-4550
Fax: (705) 735-4535
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1M1
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9090
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alberto Casses Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Casses ( CPSO# 59271 )

Business Address:
Georgian Professional Centre
303 - 125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone Number: (705) 735-4555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALBERTO CASSES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASSES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1995