Casses, Fernando (CPSO#: 56579)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 26 Jan 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jan 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Jan 1996