Cassidy, Keri-Leigh (CPSO#: 70548)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5909 Veteran's Memorial Lane
Halifax
Nova Scotia
B3H 2E2
Halifax NS  B3H 2E2
Phone: (902) 473-7799

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KERI-LEIGH CASSIDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASSIDY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2002