Cassidy, Patrick Nial (CPSO#: 33668)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2007