Casson, Peter Raymond (CPSO#: 54559)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 25 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006