Casson, Richard Ian (CPSO#: 29356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medicine Centre
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone: (613) 533-9303
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wilson and Casson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wilson ( CPSO# 29877 )
Dr. R. Casson ( CPSO# 29356 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Family Medicine Centre
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD IAN CASSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1977