Casson, Sharon Margaret (CPSO#: 58732)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Oct 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 May 2006