Castagna, Avril Evelyn (CPSO#: 63015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 1997

Summary

Former Name: Sloane, Avril Evelyn (used until: 11 Mar 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 415
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 431-4848
Fax: (416) 431-5940
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Hospital General Site
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Castagna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Castagna ( CPSO# 63015 )
Dr. L. Castagna ( CPSO# 50374 )

Business Address:
415 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 431-4848

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 23 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVRIL EVELYN CASTAGNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTAGNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Jul 1993
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 May 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1997